Trustees THE CAMBRIDGE CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC DATA CENTRE
Charity number: 800579

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Susan Ann Bourne | Chair | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anita de Waard | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jennifer Louise Martin | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ye Li | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Per Ola Karl Engkvist | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nigel Aaron Pitchford | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Michael Goodman | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alessia Bacchi | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.