Financial history PRIDDY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 800592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.16k £13.91k £16.41k £7.97k £11.09k
Total expenditure £10.56k £9.32k £5.37k £10.98k £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £11.67k N/A N/A