SWAYTHLING YOUTH CENTRE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 18 January 1989: Standard registration
- 07 February 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 25TH FEBRUARY 1987 AND 9TH MAY 1988 AND 12TH JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE PROJECT ARE ESTABLISHED ARE TO HELP THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE DISTRICTS OF SWAYTHLING, HAMPTON PARK AND BASSETT (EAST OF HILL LANE) IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON...ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPRIITUAL COPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF SWAYTHLING, HAMPTON PARK AND BASSETT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.