Financial history FIRST RUNG LTD

Charity number: 800614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.66m £1.42m £1.40m £1.71m £2.01m
Total expenditure £1.61m £1.58m £1.61m £1.64m £1.83m
Income from government contracts £1.42m £1.39m £1.40m £1.16m £1.51m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £56.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £211 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.57m £1.39m £1.40m £1.71m £2.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £769 £101 £66 £491 £2.88k
Income - Other £82.68k £28.86k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.03m £1.52m £1.61m £1.64m £1.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.79k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £581.26k £54.63k £0 £0 £491.30k