Trustees FIRST RUNG LTD
Charity number: 800614

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Timothy Young | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hinton | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Eifion-Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohit Mahajan | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hafiza Ali | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Liz Jones | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Lawrence | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Calvin Sidney Pike | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sonal Riley | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Omar Ahmed | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.