DEAF COMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Description of Charity Activities: (max. 400 characters) Advising employees & employers. Advising on enviornment and resourses for the hearing impared. Advising on and research into hereditory, progessive, high tone sensorinural loss. Developing original equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 20 December 1988: Standard registration
- 14 June 2013: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- HEARING LINK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 30/03/2009 | 30/03/2010 | 30/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1 | £0 | £10 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1 | £0 | £30 | £3 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2011 | 12 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2010 | 10 March 2011 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE DEAF OR HARD OF HEARING BY PROVISION, STAFFING AND MAINTENANCE OF COMMUNICATIONS CENTRES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HILLINGDON LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window