FRIENDS OF MUSIC IN MAYFIELD

Charity number: 800640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of music particularly but not exclusively in the Parish of Mayfield East Sussex

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £6,372
Total expenditure: £690

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Patricia Clayton Trustee 03 December 2019
None on record
Henry Swanton Trustee 09 November 2015
None on record
JONATHAN JONES Trustee
MUSIC IN MAYFIELD LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £10.89k £7.14k £8.79k £7.22k £6.37k
Total expenditure £0 £300 £57.76k £6.45k £690
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 23 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 22 May 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LUCKS FARM HOUSE
GREENWOODS LANE
PUNNETTS TOWN
HEATHFIELD
TN21 9HU
Phone:
01435830301