EALING AND HOUNSLOW COMMUNITY VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ealing and Hounslow CVS provides a wide range of support services for voluntary and community groups in the London Boroughs of Ealing and Hounslow, including funding advice, help with recruiting volunteers, information on voluntary sector developments and good practice, and training. It incorporates Ealing Volunteer Centre and Hounslow Volunteer Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£951,793
Donations and legacies | £500 | |
Charitable activities | £938.68k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.62k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£644,069
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £644.07k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £524,040 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £644.07k | |
Retained for future use | £307.72k |
People

10 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Hounslow
Governance
- 15 June 1989: Standard registration
- EALING CVS (Working name)
- EALING & HOUNSLOW COMMUNITY VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- EALING AND HOUNSLOW COMMUNITY VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- EALING COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- EALING COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sukbinder Johnny Nota | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosi Prescott | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Brenner | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nazim Shah | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
YUUSUF GUULED | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Balvinder Chahal | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY ANSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £712.56k | £652.20k | £676.46k | £828.13k | £938.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £584.07k | £496.28k | £568.04k | £583.78k | £644.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £140.12k | N/A | £165.28k | £150.25k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £341.87k | £394.64k | £295.92k | £444.90k | £524.04k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £712.56k | £652.12k | £676.41k | £824.67k | £938.68k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £81 | £50 | £3.46k | £12.62k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £584.07k | £496.28k | £568.04k | £583.78k | £644.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £981 | £158 | £579 | £227 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £79.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £22.62k | £23.01k | £28.62k | £15.19k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £307.76k | £513.02k | £615.09k | £729.06k | £1.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £58.78k | £130.73k | £124.77k | £0 | £69.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 JULY 1998, 18 JULY 2002 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 28 Apr 2021 as amended on 28 Apr 2021 as amended on 28 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF EALING AND HOUNSLOW AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, UNEMPLOYMENT, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, THE DEVELOPMENT OF SOCIAL WELFARE, THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND THE PROMOTION OF URBAN REGENERATION. 3.2 TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3.3 TO BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND TO PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Broads Foundry
Trumpers Way
LONDON
W7 2QP
- Phone:
- 07551 016775
- Email:
- info@ehcvs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window