Accounts and annual returns PARLIAMENT HILL SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 800708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 October 2024 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 October 2023 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 November 2022 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 November 2022 635 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required