LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF LIVINGSTONE HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY HEALTH UNIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Kent
Governance
- 06 March 1989: Standard registration
- 20 February 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE LIVINGSTONE HOSPITAL, DARTFORD AND THE COMMUNITY HEALTH UNIT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.04k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.44k | £2.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 12 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 26 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1955 AS AMENDED 26TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
DARTFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window