Accounts and annual returns THE BOB AND BARBARA MARSHALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 800787
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2010 14 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 09 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 04 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required