Accounts and annual returns OPERATION HAPPY CHILD

Charity number: 800793
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 22 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 06 January 2016 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 16 February 2016 201 days late
Annual return 30 September 2013 07 August 2014 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 07 August 2014 8 days late