Financial history SOUTHWICK PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 800799
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/10/2016
Total gross income £50.03k £44.79k £54.15k £63.07k £46.04k
Total expenditure £50.21k £47.26k £53.09k £68.75k £54.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £36.69k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0