Financial history HUNTINGDON, PETERBOROUGH AND CAMBRIDGE MS THERAPY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 800849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £61.85k £27.04k £77.05k £94.39k £95.08k
Total expenditure £76.89k £65.65k £90.43k £120.95k £100.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £700