FRIENDS OF BOX HILL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assist in the conservation of the natural beauty of the National Trust property of Box Hill and in the protection and improvement of its amenities for the benefit of the public, and advance the education of the public regarding Box Hill and its ecology and to further this aim it has produced a number of publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 February 1989: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF BOX HILL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS LYN RICHARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon John Ward | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES LAMBERT | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE HERRING | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN RICHARDS | Trustee | 14 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN SANKEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAIL JEFFCOATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY WEDGWOOD | Trustee |
|
||||||
BEN TATHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD HAGON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.58k | £4.28k | £3.54k | £2.89k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.28k | £931 | £2.72k | £812 | £6.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPED 21ST JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
I. TO CONSERVE OR ASSIST IN THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL BEAUTY OF THE NATIONAL TRUST PROPERTY OF BOX HILL AND TO PROTECT AND TO IMPROVE OR ASSIST IN THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF ITS AMENITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. II. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING BOX HILL AND ITS ECOLOGY.
Area of benefit
THE NATIONAL TRUST PROPERTY OF BOX HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
REDWING
HEADLEY HEATH APPROACH
TADWORTH
KT20 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01737842889
- Email:
- lyn@mra.uk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window