M S INFORMATION AND THERAPY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of treatments for MS, neurological and long term chronic conditions. As well as sports injury rehabilitation. On site treatments are provided by professional practitioners. The centre provides information on benefits, research and symptom management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £53,502 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 06 February 1989: Standard registration
- CHARCOT THERAPY CENTRE (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE MS INFORMATION AND THERAPY CENTRE (Working name)
- HBO THERAPY CENTRE GLOUCESTER (Working name)
- MS THERAPY CENTRE GLOS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael McCulloch | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Peat | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paulene Fitchard-Taffe | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Speed | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Hutchinson | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
vikki sewell | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Prout | Trustee | 14 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.62k | £96.61k | £81.37k | £122.30k | £138.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.53k | £102.50k | £96.61k | £143.51k | £148.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £23.14k | £7.48k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £46.10k | N/A | £30.41k | £53.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 17 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCTOBER 1994 as amended on 04 May 2022 as amended on 26 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
To aid and improve for the public benefit in the Area of Benefit the condition of those living with neurological and long term conditions by any lawful means including any of the following means: - (a) by bringing together persons living with a neurological or a long term condition and persons interested in these conditions; (b) by providing advice guidance and moral and practical support for persons living with a neurological or a long term condition; (c) by providing therapy (including hyperbaric oxygen therapy) for persons living with a neurological or a long term condition or other symptoms or conditions.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE AND SOUTH WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 FRAMPTON ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL1 5QB
- Phone:
- 01452419246
- Email:
- info@thecharcot.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window