Accounts and annual returns SAD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800917
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 19 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 16 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2015 11 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required