Financial history SAD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 800917
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017
Total gross income £9.66k £12.55k £7.96k £29.92k £14.96k
Total expenditure £18.54k £11.70k £4.26k £4.29k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0