THE DAY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of homes for the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Robert Peter Denning | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Helen Norris | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||
Timothy Thomas | Trustee | 04 March 2010 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||
SYLVIA JUNE BICKERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.87k | £184.10k | £153.00k | £164.85k | £169.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.50k | £180.67k | £161.83k | £194.59k | £189.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.20k | £18.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH JANUARY 1987 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE AND SUPPORT DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES HOMES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE OR HAVE LIVED IN CODDENHAM OR IN THE NEIGHBOURING OR SURROUNDING AREAS. 2. TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLORS DIRECT. 3. AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SETTLORS TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
CODDENAHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haysel House
Mary Day Close
Coddenham
IPSWICH
IP6 9SR
- Phone:
- 01449761732
- Email:
- hayselhouse@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window