THE WORLD PARROT TRUST

Charity number: 800944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The World Parrot Trust conducts and funds conservation projects for rare species of parrot around the world; encourages high standards in pet parrot care; campaigns to halt the trade in wild-caught parrots and informs and educates via our quarterly magazine 'PsittaScene' our monthly eNewsletter 'Flock Talk' and website www.parrots.org.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolivia
  • Costa Rica
  • France
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Honduras
  • Indonesia
  • Norfolk Island
  • Senegal
  • Sierra Leone

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WPT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON HALES Chair
WORLD PARROT TRUST
Recently registered
Joseph Davenport Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
RUUD VONK Trustee
None on record
STEVE MARTIN Trustee
None on record
CRISTIANA SENNI Trustee
None on record
NICHOLAS REYNOLDS Trustee
None on record
DAVID WOOLCOCK Trustee
WORLD PARROT TRUST
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £526.04k £1.52m £605.71k £420.89k £1.17m
Total expenditure £602.28k £509.18k £715.55k £604.27k £506.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.71k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £487.52k £1.48m £392.15k N/A £1.08m
Income - Other trading activities £38.42k £35.96k £78.46k N/A £26.80k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £134.89k N/A £50.71k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £105 £117 £216 N/A £12.18k
Income - Other £0 £6.71k £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £14.69k £1.20m £31.75k N/A £948.73k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £553.26k £464.51k £657.20k N/A £485.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.02k £44.67k £58.35k N/A £21.24k
Expenditure - Governance £146.22k £2.70k £9.39k N/A £9.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £94.14k £0 £0 N/A £14.10k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £52.62k £4.99k £3.76k N/A £58.92k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £141.63k £1.21m £1.11m N/A £1.56m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £10.01k £18.60k £21.41k N/A £14.33k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 June 2023 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 June 2023 139 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2023 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2023 358 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLANMOR HOUSE
HAYLE
CORNWALL
TR27 4HB
Phone:
01736751026