CAMBRIDGE PSYCHOTHERAPY ASSISTANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money and receive donations to help people pay for psychotherapy who could not otherwise afford it. This is restricted to the Cambridge area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 March 1989: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Miller | Chair | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Fliss CADBURY | Trustee | 08 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Purseglove | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Mason | Trustee | 04 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.54k | £6.05k | £11.60k | £7.82k | £4.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £8.68k | £9.52k | £6.14k | £7.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT MENTAL HEALTH BY TH PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPY TREATMENT AND FACILITIES FOR REHABILITATION IN THE CAMBRIDGE AREA FOR PERSONS IN NEED RESIDENT THEREIN SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL DISORDERS OR MENTAL OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Bishops Road
Trumpington
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 9NQ
- Phone:
- 07434738070
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window