MEVAGISSEY HARBOUR AQUARIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide an educational resource, showing the marine life associated with Mevagissey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Celia Mitchell | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Bowles | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY INGRAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID HUNKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.92k | £19.84k | £28.20k | £33.27k | £50.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.00k | £8.91k | £18.86k | £28.69k | £50.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF MARINE BIOLOGY INCLUDING THE STUDY OF FISH FOUND IN CORNISH WATERS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN AQUARIUM. (2) TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE OF MEVAGISSEY HARBOUR TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
MEVAGISSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARBOUR OFFICE
ISLAND QUAY
MEVAGISSEY
ST. AUSTELL
CORNWALL
PL26 6QU
- Phone:
- 01726843305
- Email:
- meva.harbour@talk21.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window