THE KIDNEY FUND

Charity Number: 800952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of education and research into renal failure and diabetes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £396,377
Total expenditure: £301,611

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Richmond Upon Thames
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SOUTH WEST THAMES KIDNEY FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr AKINWALE DAVID MAKANJUOLA Chair 08 August 2013
None on record
Clare Feasby Trustee 19 February 2025
None on record
Christopher John Moorhouse Trustee 03 July 2024
BARNES METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Anita Abena-Amoako Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
NICHOLAS PETER FORD Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
CHRISTOPHER HOWARD Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
Dr MICHAEL BENDING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.43k £308.62k £127.99k £476.14k £396.38k
Total expenditure £171.90k £180.14k £102.20k £156.84k £301.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Kidney Fund
Renal Research
St. Helier Hospital
Wrythe Lane
CARSHALTON
SM5 1AA
Phone:
02082962000