WOODCHURCH MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
** Has now been superseded by Woodchurch Heritage CIO Trust Charity# 1193824 ** The trust operates a museum and study centre covering the social history of the parish of Woodchurch and its immediate environment, from the earliest times to the present. It also offers outreach services to schools and other organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bromley
- East Sussex
- Hackney
- Kent
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Medway
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 12 April 1989: Standard registration
- WOODCHURCH MUSEUM (Working name)
- WOODCHURCH VILLAGE LIFE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Wade James Nash | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85k | £18.51k | £29.40k | £5.59k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.55k | £10.95k | £12.35k | £12.37k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.31k | £21.55k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 February 2025 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 December 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF THE MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECT TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A COLLECTION. (B) TO FORM, ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE COMPANIES INSTITUTIONS ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS OR SOCIETIES FORMED FOR OBJECTS SIMILAR TO THE OBJECTS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodchurch Village Life Museum
Susans Hill
Woodchurch
TN26 3RE
- Phone:
- 01233860586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window