Financial history THE HARTLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 800968
Charity reporting is up to date (97 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/03/2020 15/03/2021 15/03/2022 15/03/2023 15/03/2024
Total gross income £62.52k £68.87k £54.69k £56.32k £62.36k
Total expenditure £93.27k £70.53k £69.71k £68.54k £75.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A