ALTON PANCRAS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants for the benefit of individual inhabitants of the village of Alton Pancras, Dorset, and of the village as a whole. Recent examples of the latter include substantial contributions to the cost of: A wildlife habitat adjoining the village A Village Map for the information of residents and visitors A Village History project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 22 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Colin Carron Brown | Chair | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Metcalf | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Ann Gerard | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bland | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Rodney Norman Potts | Trustee | 01 June 2007 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE BRAZIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £1.02k | £1.59k | £1.10k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £918 | £361 | £1.19k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST JANUARY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALTON PANCRAS IN THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ALTON PANCRAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Holcombe Mead,
ALTON PANCRAS
Nr Dorchester
Dorset
DT2 7RT
- Phone:
- 07799 654988
- Email:
- shadowhamlet57@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window