Financial history STOKE HILL PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity Number: 800998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £112.77k £104.82k £147.78k £213.97k £312.88k
Total expenditure £120.03k £116.82k £133.86k £211.97k £261.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £76.99k £79.80k £86.82k £94.73k