Financial history BLETCHLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity Number: 801003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.71k £3.25k £850 £2.19k £336
Total expenditure £2.87k £2.27k £1.17k £3.96k £960
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A