ROTARY CLUB OF DEANE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support to Rotary and other local charities with major fundraising activities including various concerts and an International Amateur Boxing Evening between England and a visiting overseas team in conjunction with the Amateur Boxing Association of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 March 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Temple | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Richard Lakin | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cyril Greenaway | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Karen McLatch | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Knights | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.30k | £120.30k | £52.73k | £67.04k | £57.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.90k | £74.90k | £66.46k | £73.80k | £72.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH AUGUST 1987
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY, TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Cortland Drive
Bramley
TADLEY
Hampshire
RG26 5WL
- Phone:
- 01256 597463
- Email:
- davefrondeg@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window