Accounts and annual returns ST MAWGAN IN PYDAR CHURCH HALL TRUST

Charity number: 801082
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 December 2020 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 December 2020 398 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 December 2020 763 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required