ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES ARTS COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as the 'go to' arts, cultural and well-being organisation in the Borough of Kingston. KA offers assistance to its members in their growth and affiliations. KA represent the activities of the voluntary professional arts and well-being sectors in the Borough by organising and promoting high-profile arts and well-being events. KA runs networking events for affiliates and the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 February 1989: Standard registration
- KINGSTON ARTS COUNCIL (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR WILL SUMMERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.89k | £3.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED 7TH NOVEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 03 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Area of benefit
ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Arts Centre
The Corner House
116 Douglas Road
SURBITON
KT6 7SB
- Phone:
- 07939583706
- Email:
- info@kingstonarts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window