ACLI (CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF ITALIAN WORKERS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty Advancement of education Provision of cultural and recreational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 March 1989: Standard registration
- ASSOCIAZIONI CRISTIANE LAVORATORI ITALIANI (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Giovanni D'Angelo | Chair | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Giuseppe Chiappetta | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eduardo Pellegrino | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.95k | £24.36k | £18.28k | £10.92k | £8.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.06k | £12.21k | £11.59k | £21.88k | £10.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £17.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED 2ND MAY 1991
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE TEACHING OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH BY;- (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (C) THE INSTRUCTION AND THE PROFESSIONAL TRAINING OF THE WORKER AND THE YOUNG (D) THE PROVISION OF CULTURAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE WORKER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o G Teoli & Co,
Balfour House
741 High Road
LONDON
London
N12 0BP
- Phone:
- 020 83439119
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window