Financial history CERE-PAL (PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT SPASTIC SOCIETY)

Charity Number: 801116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.05k £1.73k £1.08k £1.21k £2.38k
Total expenditure £5.43k £3.55k £4.85k £4.29k £9.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A