CERE-PAL (PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT SPASTIC SOCIETY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cere-pal is a local group of volunteers,parents and friends who are caring for people with cerebral palsy in and around the Peterborough area. The group exists to enable people to share experiences and provide mutual support. Our fund-raising enables us to provide services, advice, equipment etc through grant aid and lobbying to help those with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 09 March 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE ELIZABETH SHARPE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NIGEL BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA WOOLLARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £1.73k | £1.08k | £1.21k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £3.55k | £4.85k | £4.29k | £9.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, TREATMENT, EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT AND ADVANCEMENT IN THE CIMMUNITY OF CEREBRAL PALSIED PERSONS AND OTHER DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 MACE ROAD
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 8RQ
- Phone:
- 01733766333
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window