RELEASE LEGAL EMERGENCY AND DRUGS SERVICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Release is the national centre of expertise on drugs and drugs law providing free and confidential specialist advice to the public and professionals via our national legal and drugs helpline. The charity also provides the following frontline services: therapeutic counselling, expert witness (reports and testimony) and legal outreach surgeries, as well as a number of free publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£659,460
Donations and legacies | £8.70k | |
Charitable activities | £641.46k | |
Other trading activities | £119 | |
Investments | £7.67k | |
Other | £1.51k |
Total expenditure:
£869,060
Raising funds | £24.58k | |
Charitable activities | £844.48k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £24.58k | |
Charitable expenditure | £844.48k |
People

17 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 May 1985: Standard registration
- 29 March 2019: Funds received from 256818 THE NORTHMOOR TRUST
- RELEASE (Working name)
- RELEASE LEADS (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Horne | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Krykant | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imani Robinson | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donnchadh Greene | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bisola Akintoye | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Toby Seddon | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Dhumma | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROWNTREE | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMBER MARKS | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER GOLLAND | Trustee | 24 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £766.50k | £803.22k | £588.86k | £938.72k | £659.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £741.58k | £707.34k | £633.55k | £751.03k | £869.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £510.16k | £628.82k | £396.72k | £732.65k | £8.70k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £481 | £119 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £255.94k | £173.96k | £189.50k | £203.04k | £641.46k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £394 | £451 | £70 | £1.59k | £7.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £2.57k | £969 | £1.51k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | £1.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £725.71k | £682.58k | £617.59k | £730.92k | £844.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £15.88k | £24.76k | £15.11k | £19.53k | £24.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £12.75k | £11.00k | £13.25k | £13.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £854 | £591 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £73.37k | £54.24k | £35.12k | £32.54k | £12.41k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £362.31k | £470.13k | £443.23k | £636.14k | £456.32k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £23.54k | £16.35k | £15.02k | £17.66k | £27.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM POVERY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM DRUG ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL AND WELFARE ADVICE, AND ASSISTANCE AND ALL OTHER SERVICES NECESSARY FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS, AS DEFINED HEREIN. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE AREAS OF WORK ABOVE-MENTIONED AND IN PARTICULAR WITH REGARD TO NEW TRENDS IN THOSE AREAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Mansell Street
LONDON
E1 8AN
- Phone:
- 02073242979
- Email:
- admin@release.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window