INTERNATIONAL MICROELECTRONICS ASSEMBLY AND PACKAGING SOCIETY - UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IMAPS-UK supports the personal networking and training needs of engineers, scientists and students in the UK microelectronics industry. It has a policy of collaboration and co-operation with like technical institutions and holds technical events throughout the year for the benefit of its members and the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 March 1989: Standard registration
- I M A P S - U K (Working name)
- INTERNATIONAL MICROELECTRONICS AND PACKAGING SOCIETY - UK (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR HYBRID MICROELECTRONICS (UK) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Suzanne Costello | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID LIPP | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Phillip Brown | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter George Barnwell | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.03k | £24.75k | £64.68k | £119.25k | £317.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.72k | £31.46k | £29.50k | £98.02k | £285.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.51k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/02/1980 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2014 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE AND APPLICATION OF HYBRID MICROELECTRONICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Edwards Close
Thurlestone
KINGSBRIDGE
TQ7 3BP
- Phone:
- 07831685139
- Email:
- treasurer@imaps.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window