THE OXTED SCHOOL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and bursaries from donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 May 1989: Standard registration
- 01 May 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE OXTED COUNTY SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.25k | £3.40k | £5.72k | £6.77k | £965 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.63k | £16.89k | £0 | £129 | £24.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 March 2025 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 February 2022 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JANUARY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT OXTED COUNTY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
OXTED COUNTY SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window