Financial history BROMLEY FAMILY LINK

Charity number: 801156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.44k £10.66k £50.12k £60.76k £76.21k
Total expenditure £14.24k £6.99k £40.44k £58.47k £83.65k
Income from government contracts N/A £8.82k N/A N/A £41.48k
Income from government grants £4.40k N/A £23.52k £28.16k N/A