THE GORILLA ORGANIZATION ENDOWMENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 1989: Standard registration
- 27 June 2007: Removed
- 27 June 2007: Funds transferred to 1117131-1 THE GORILLA ORGANIZATION ENDOWMENT FUND
- THE DIAN FOSSEY GORILLA FUND EUROPE (Previous name)
- THE DIAN FOSSEY GORILLA FUND UK (Previous name)
- THE DIGIT FUND UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £956.96k | £1.12m | |
|
Total expenditure | £960.32k | £976.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 20 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 27 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 November 2005 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 16 November 2005 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 FEB 2007
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND THE PRESERVATION OF GORILLAS IN THEIR NATURAL HABITAT IN AFRICA AND THEIR PROTECTION FROM EXTINCTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window