Accounts and annual returns WEST ESSEX FAMILY MEDIATION SERVICE

Charity number: 801189
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 23 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 11 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 20 February 2008 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 20 February 2008 20 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 09 February 2006 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 January 2006 On Time