WEST ESSEX FAMILY MEDIATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering family mediation and information about family mediation to separating and separated couples and their children where apporpriate. Offering short term family change support to children and parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 13 April 1989: Standard registration
- 10 December 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NATIONAL FAMILY MEDIATION HERTS & ESSEX (Working name)
- THE HERTS & ESSEX FAMILY MEDIATION SERVICE (Working name)
- WEST ESSEX FAMILY CONCILIATION SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.10k | £96.07k | £112.53k | £111.88k | £96.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.60k | £115.86k | £128.17k | £112.38k | £100.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 20 February 2008 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 20 February 2008 | 20 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 09 February 2006 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 16 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1989 AND 28TH JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE THE DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE IN THE INTERESTS OF PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN INVOLVED THEREIN AND TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window