BIFU/WAR ON WANT UNION AID FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 1989: Standard registration
- 16 July 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE OVERSEAS PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES OF WAR ON WANT, TO ALLEVIATE POVERTY DISTRESS SUFFERING AND ILL HEALTH IN THE COUNTRIES WHICH ARE ECONOMICALLY UNDER PRIVILEGED THROUGH WANT OF DEVELOPMENT OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE THIRD WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window