Financial history FORTISMERE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 801227
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £14.98k £28.33k £17.74k £26.85k £11.07k
Total expenditure £16.42k £32.17k £14.72k £30.29k £11.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A