GURU NANAK SIKH GURDWARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity continues to hold religious services for the local congregation. There are weekly classes to teach Punjabi language and Sikh religion to children. The local schools visit the charity premises to observe the Sikh way of worship and living. The charity supports local and international charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 April 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harpreet Singh Parhar | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manmohan Singh Chohan | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sohan Singh | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harleen Singh | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gurjit Singh Minhas | Trustee | 30 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.08k | £4.01k | £17.45k | £28.84k | £28.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.95k | £8.39k | £7.39k | £19.69k | £21.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 April 2025 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADPOTED 12TH FEBRUARY 1989
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION AMONG SIKHS RESIDING IN HITCHIN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROVIDING A TEMPLE AND BY THE ORGANISATION AND CELEBRATION AT SIKH RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BOTH SIKHS AND NON SIKHS IN SIKH RELIGION AND CULTURE IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISIONS OF A LIBRARY AND INFORMATION BUREAU. (III) TO PROVIDE FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR, SICK AND AGED IN THE SIKH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
HITCHIN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guro Nanak Sikh Gurdwara
37 Wilbury Way
HITCHIN
Hertfordshire
SG4 0TW
- Phone:
- 01582405292
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window