LABURNUM BOAT CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Canoeing, youth club, inclusion club, adult club, schools canoeing, narrowboatnhg
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £107,591 from 8 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 31 March 1989: Standard registration
- The Laburnum Boat Club (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dmitry Poluektov | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Porteous | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Farrow | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verity Gill Dennison | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Elaine Davies | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rohney Lakshmi Saggar | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Graham Stewart | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Bruce Sangster LOGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE DIANE ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE PATRICK HAMMILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE ANNE CULLINAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARNIE COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.97k | £239.41k | £314.34k | £358.03k | £385.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £365.60k | £220.37k | £324.98k | £335.88k | £374.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £94.42k | £88.51k | £71.73k | £104.43k | £107.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH MARCH 1989 as amended on 17 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(A) THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS. (B) THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LABURNUM BOAT CLUB
LABURNUM STREET
LONDON
E2 8BH
- Phone:
- 02077292915
- Email:
- info@laburnumboatclub.com
- Website:
-
laburnumboatclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window