Trustees LABURNUM BOAT CLUB
Charity number: 801255
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dmitry Poluektov | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Christopher Porteous | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Farrow | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Verity Gill Dennison | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Elaine Davies | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rohney Lakshmi Saggar | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Graham Stewart | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Bruce Sangster LOGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE DIANE ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE PATRICK HAMMILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE ANNE CULLINAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARNIE COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIAN JOHN PUTKOWSKI | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.