PLYMOUTH PISCES SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PLYMOUTH PISCES SWIMMING CLUB PROVIDES A PRIVATE SWIIMING SESSION FOR ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH ANY TYPE OF DISABILITY. FAMILIES AND CARERS ARE MOST WELCOME. WE MEET AT CENTRAL PK SWIMMING POOL OUTLAND RD PLYMOUTH FROM 11AM-1PM ON MOST SUNDAYS DURING THE YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 30 March 1989: Standard registration
- PLYMOUTH PISCES (Working name)
- PLYMOUTH PISCES SWIMMING CLUB FOR THE HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRENE ALICE WILLS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS S HICKS | Trustee | 18 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RICHARD LADEMANN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.19k | £2.90k | £5.06k | £3.87k | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.93k | £1.42k | £1.64k | £5.39k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 24TH JANUARY 1989 AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SWIMMING FACILITIES TOGETHER WITH SOCIAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES IN PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
THE PLYMOUTH AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 KINGSWEAR CRESCENT
PLYMOUTH
PL6 5PJ
- Phone:
- 01752510989
- Email:
- paul@pisces-club.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window