MAIDSTONE INDEPENDENT CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the understanding, teaching and demonstration of Christian spiritualism. We hold three divine services every week, a healing service weekly and regular special events and open days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 09 May 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha-Jayne Baxter | Chair | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA LEVER | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.85k | £1.69k | £3.29k | £6.75k | £15.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.67k | £5.00k | £3.98k | £8.32k | £18.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/03/1989 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE RELIGION, PHILOSOPHY AND PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Boughton Lane
Maidstone
ME15 9QW
- Phone:
- 01622741731
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window