SPECIAL NEEDS ENTERPRISES (NORFOLK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education and relief of young people with learning difficulties. This is achieved through the provision of a programme of life skills training which encompasses numeracy and literacy, IT, arts and crafts and social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £132,346 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 09 June 1989: Standard registration
- STEPPING STONES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Croll-Knight | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Hall | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Robey | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Riches | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY WITHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.11k | £211.04k | £200.31k | £189.82k | £220.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.19k | £179.01k | £193.29k | £218.95k | £248.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £96.85k | £109.51k | £118.67k | £116.96k | £132.35k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23RD MAY 1989, 25 AUGUST 1992 AND 6 AUGUST 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH SPECIAL NEEDS RESIDENT IN NORFOLK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF LIMITED PERIODS OF WORK EXPERIENCE AND SUCH TRAINING FACILITIES AS WOULD ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stepping Stones
Heartsease Lane
NORWICH
NR7 9NR
- Phone:
- 01603419996
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window