SIGNPOST AND YOUTH ENQUIRY SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 AND THE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS AND TO PROVIDE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND OTHER THERAPEUTIC SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £32,586 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.76k | £193.70k | £204.82k | £178.60k | £173.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.69k | £164.09k | £182.80k | £191.87k | £182.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £56.60k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £13.60k | £28.00k | £32.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 15 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 15 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 27 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 18 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/03/1989 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF SIGNPOST ARE: I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND THE PARENTS, CARERS OR GUARDIANS OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS AND II) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND OTHER THERAPEUTIC SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, NATIONALITY, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL BELIEFS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window